Gunn v. Coffee 911 et al
Plaintiff: Greg Gunn
Defendant: Coffee 911 and Michael Hennessy
Case Number: 2:2018cv00643
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0005
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/8/2018. (las)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Coffee 911 answer due 10/26/2018; Michael Hennessy answer due 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/27/2018. (las)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendants Coffee 911, Michael Hennessy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Snow, Christopher)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #10 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Coffee 911, Michael Hennessy. (las)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Coffee 911 answer due 9/26/2018; Michael Hennessy answer due 9/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/11/2018. (las)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendants Coffee 911, Michael Hennessy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Snow, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Coffee 911, Michael Hennessy, Plaintiff Greg Gunn. Form due by 9/24/2018. (las)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Coffee 911, Michael Hennessy, Plaintiff Greg Gunn. (las)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaunda L. McNeill on behalf of Coffee 911, Michael Hennessy (McNeill, Shaunda)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Snow on behalf of Coffee 911, Michael Hennessy (Snow, Christopher)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greg Gunn as to Coffee 911 served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Court Issued Summons)(Smith, Gregory)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greg Gunn as to Michael Hennessy served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Court Issued Summons)(Smith, Gregory)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Hennessy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Coffee 911. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3083156) filed by Greg Gunn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Smith, Gregory)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Greg Gunn is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunn v. Coffee 911 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffee 911
Represented By: Shaunda L. McNeill
Represented By: Christopher B. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennessy
Represented By: Shaunda L. McNeill
Represented By: Christopher B. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Gunn
Represented By: Gregory Brent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?