Eillis v. Bulver
Plaintiff: Paul Ryan Eillis
Defendant: Sarah Bulver
Case Number: 2:2018cv00687
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sarah Bulver.(Martinez, Christopher)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Paul Ryan Eillis. (Siebers, Spencer)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Paul Ryan Eillis. (las)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Sarah Bulver. (las)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Sarah Bulver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Order of Discharge)(Martinez, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Sarah Bulver, Plaintiff Paul Ryan Eillis. Form due by 9/19/2018. (tlh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Sarah Bulver, Plaintiff Paul Ryan Eillis. (tlh)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Silver Summit County, case number 180500325, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3093781) filed by Sarah Bulver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Martinez, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Defendant Sarah Bulver is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eillis v. Bulver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Bulver
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Represented By: Jonathan C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Ryan Eillis
Represented By: Spencer C. Siebers
Represented By: Benjamin W. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?