Connor Sport Court International v. Shijiazhuang Enlio Sports Goods

Defendant: Shijiazhuang Enlio Sports Goods
Petitioner: Connor Sport Court International
Case Number: 2:2018cv00778
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/18/2018. (las)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Shijiazhuang Enlio Sports Goods. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Shijiazhuang Enlio Sports Goods (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3118267) filed by Connor Sport Court International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (deJonge, Peter)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Petitioner Connor Sport Court International is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor Sport Court International v. Shijiazhuang Enlio Sports Goods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Connor Sport Court International
Represented By: Kurtis M. Hendricks
Represented By: Peter M. deJonge
Represented By: Jed H. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shijiazhuang Enlio Sports Goods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?