Thornwall v. Wal-Mart Associates
Plaintiff: Amie Thornwall
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates
Case Number: 2:2018cv00779
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/9/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Motions due by 2/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. 4 Day Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/7/2018. (mas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/16/2018. (mas)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/15/2018. (reb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates. (Rice, Mitchel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING of State Court Dockets. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket)(mas)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Amie Thornwall, Defendant Wal-Mart Associates. (tlh)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Associates.(Rice, Mitchel)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3118564) filed by Wal-Mart Associates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Rice, Mitchel)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Defendant Wal-Mart Associates is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornwall v. Wal-Mart Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amie Thornwall
Represented By: Michael L. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?