Taylor v. Western Governors University
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Defendant: Western Governors University
Case Number: 2:2018cv00780
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Western Governors University answer due 12/31/2018. (dla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 CLERKS ORDER Granting #18 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) Motion to the Clerk of Court to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint Pursuant to DUCivR 77-2(a)(2). Defendant shall have until 12/31/2018 in which to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (dla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #17 Amended Complaint Pursuant to DUCivR 77-2-(a)(2) filed by Defendant Western Governors University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Western Governors University with Jury Demand. filed by Richard Taylor. (Jackson, Brian)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Western Governors University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Severance Agreement, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from Employee Handbook)(Rice, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #10 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/6/2018. (las)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Western Governors University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Western Governors University. (las)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Richard Taylor, Defendant Western Governors University. Form due by 11/6/2018. (las)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Richard Taylor, Defendant Western Governors University. (las)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jascha Kennedy Clark on behalf of Western Governors University (Clark, Jascha)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Certified Mail served on Registered Agent on 10/11/18, filed by Plaintiff Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return of Service)(Jackson, Brian)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER signed by Anne Morgan. Answer deadline updated for Western Governors University answer due 11/9/2018. (las)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, Pursuant to DUCivR 77-2-(a)(2) filed by Defendant Western Governors University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Robert O. Rice added to party Western Governors University(pty:dft)(Rice, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/9/2018. (las)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Western Governors University. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Western Governors University (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3118743) filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Jackson, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Richard Taylor is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Western Governors University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Governors University
Represented By: Robert O. Rice
Represented By: Jascha Kennedy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Represented By: Brian Keven Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?