doTerra International v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: doTerra International
Defendant: Shane Jackson and Jennifer Jackson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00781
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the arbitrators decision is confirmed, and the Defendants claims below are dismissed with prejudice. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/20/18. (jlw)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/20/18. (jlw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #2 MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement filed by Plaintiff doTerra International. (Harris, Aaron)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING re #2 MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement filed by Plaintiff doTerra International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order Confirming Arbitration Award)(Harris, Aaron)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/23/2018. (tco)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 5 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Given the procedural posture of this case #2 , consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge is not immediately feasible. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through the random reassignment process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/22/2018. (amn)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award served on Shane Jackson on 10/16/2018, filed by Plaintiff doTerra International. (Harris, Aaron)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award served on Jennifer Jackson on 10/16/2018, filed by Plaintiff doTerra International. (Harris, Aaron)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement filed by Plaintiff doTerra International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy Manual, #2 Exhibit B - July 20, 2017 Letter from the AAA, #3 Exhibit C - October 19, 2017 Email from Michael Zimmerman, #4 Exhibit D - Order No. 5, #5 Exhibit E - Order #6, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, Aaron)
October 5, 2018 Civil Case Filing Fee for Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award received from Plaintiff doTerra International. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3118927). (Harris, Aaron)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff doTerra International is directed to E-File the Civil Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Compel and cover sheet ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: doTerra International v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: doTerra International
Represented By: Steven C. Smith
Represented By: Kipp S. Muir
Represented By: Aaron R. Harris
Represented By: Christopher D. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?