AVT New York v. Olivet University
Plaintiff: AVT New York
Defendant: Olivet Unversity
Case Number: 2:2018cv00782
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Olivet Unversity. (las)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 6 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case and the inability of certain defendants to consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge because they have not pled or otherwise defended this case, the court ORDERS this case reassigned to a district judge. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/29/18. (docket text order no attached document)(mjw)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff AVT New York. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nate, Kennedy)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by AVT New York as to Olivet Unversity served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Nate, Kennedy)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Olivet Unversity. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Olivet Unversity (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3119115) filed by AVT New York. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (McNeill, Jason)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff AVT New York is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVT New York v. Olivet University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVT New York
Represented By: Jason A. McNeill
Represented By: Kennedy D. Nate
Represented By: Brian E. Lahti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivet Unversity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?