My Sweet Petunia v. Stampin' Up!
Plaintiff: My Sweet Petunia
Defendant: Stampin' Up!
Case Number: 2:2018cv00796
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time for Submittal of Proposed Schedule. It is hereby ordered that the deadline for submitting a proposed schedule is extended until January 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/04/2018. (kpf)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Submittal of Proposed Schedule and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff My Sweet Petunia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time)(Swensen, Lara)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shane V. Cortesi for My Sweet Petunia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/23/2018. (las)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shane V. Cortesi , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3129806, filed by Plaintiff My Sweet Petunia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Swensen, Lara)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Shane V. Cortesi, for Plaintiff My Sweet Petunia (tlh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by My Sweet Petunia as to Stampin' Up! Waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (Swensen, Lara)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Stampin' Up!. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff My Sweet Petunia. (Swensen, Lara)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/12/2018. (las)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Stampin' Up! (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3122406) filed by My Sweet Petunia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - '531 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - '812 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - '875 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - Product Photographs, #5 Exhibit 5 - Product Description, #6 Exhibit 6 - Product Instruction Photographs, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Swensen, Lara)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff My Sweet Petunia is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Sweet Petunia v. Stampin' Up!
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Sweet Petunia
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Lara A. Swensen
Represented By: Shane V. Cortesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stampin' Up!
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?