Jackson v. State of Utah
Plaintiff: Triginal D. Jackson
Defendant: State of Utah
Interested Party: Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2018cv00802
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2018 re #3 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Triginal D. Jackson. Plaintiff, Triginal Jackson present. Court hears argument from the Plaintiff. Court takes #3 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court to issue a written order. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 9:03:25, Time End: 10:09:10, Room 8.400.)(lnp)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus : (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 09:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Court Address: 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (lnp)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Receive Electronic Notification of E-Filings Via Email. This Order only permits Mr. Jackson to receive notice via e-mail but does not give Mr. Jackson the right to file any documents via e-mail. Mr. Jackson is still required to file all documents conventionally (i.e. by mail or in-person delivery). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/23/18. (dla)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/19/2018. (mjm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Electronic Noticing (Originally received by the court on 10/12/2018) filed by Plaintiff Triginal D. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Registration Form)(nl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus (Originally received by the court on 10/12/2018) filed by Plaintiff Triginal D. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1)(nl).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: Waived. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/16/2018. (nl)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 10/12/2018) filed by Plaintiff Triginal D. Jackson. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triginal D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?