W. et al v. United Behavioral Health et al
Plaintiff: Michael W., G. W. and Kim W.
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan and United Behavioral Health
Case Number: 2:2018cv00818
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs G. W., Kim W., Michael W.. (jwt)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for United Behavioral Health answer due 1/30/2019; Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan answer due 1/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/14/2018. (las)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants United Behavioral Health, Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan, Plaintiffs G. W., Kim W., Michael W.. Form due by 12/31/2018. (las)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants United Behavioral Health, Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan, Plaintiffs G. W., Kim W., Michael W.. (las)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Deadline and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Answer Deadline) Attorney Clint R. Hansen added to party United Behavioral Health(pty:dft), Attorney Clint R. Hansen added to party Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan(pty:dft)(Hansen, Clint) Modified on 12/14/2018 by correcting motion type (las).
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3128559) filed by Michael W., G. W., Kim W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (King, Brian)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs G. W., Kim W., Michael W. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. et al v. United Behavioral Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. W.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim W.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?