US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hill
Petitioner: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Respondent: Mary Ellen Hill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00824
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service by US Securities and Exchange Commission re #4 Order, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Whipple, David)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO ENFORCE ADMINISTRATIVE SUBPOENAS- The Petition is GRANTED. The Commission shall personally serve Respondent Mary Ellen Hill (Hill) with the Petition and this order. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/8/18. (jmr)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/23/2018. (ncw)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoena. Fee waivedINSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL:(a) Email the referral manager at #utddb_referrals@utd.uscourts.gov to find out which Magistrate Judge is due for the referral.(b) Email the referred Magistrate Judge to get a Hearing date.(c) Prepare the Order Referring Case, include the hearing date(d) Email the word processing version of the Order Referring Case to the assigned District Judge. #http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/chambers-e-mail-addresses-0 filed by US Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Order) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Whipple, David) Modified by striking instructions regarding mag referral (does not apply to this type of case) on 10/23/2018 (rks).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Petitioner US Securities and Exchange Commission is directed to E-File the Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary Ellen Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J. Oliver
Represented By: David D. Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?