Ordonez v. Walmart

Plaintiff: Neyra Ordonez
Defendant: Walmart
Case Number: 2:2018cv00834
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle D. Adams on behalf of Neyra Ordonez (Adams, Kyle)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/26/2018. (jwt)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/25/2018. (eat)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 File Uploaded from Web Xchange for the 3rd District Court for Salt Lake County, Case Number 180903484, consisting of all documents filed in State Court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Summons) (eat)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Neyra Ordonez, Defendant Walmart. (nl)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180903484, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3131837) filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Rice, Mitchel)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walmart.(Rice, Mitchel)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Defendant Walmart is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ordonez v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neyra Ordonez
Represented By: T. Christian Burridge
Represented By: Matthew R. Kober
Represented By: Kyle D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?