Definitive Holdings v. Powerteq
Plaintiff: Definitive Holdings
Defendant: Powerteq
Case Number: 2:2018cv00844
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Definitive Holdings, Defendant Powerteq. Form due by 1/3/2019. (las)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Definitive Holdings, Defendant Powerteq. (las)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Definitive Holdings filed by Powerteq. Attorney Mark O. Morris added to party Powerteq(pty:dft)(Morris, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Powerteq answer due 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/21/2018. (las)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer #8 Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Definitive Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the First Amended Complaint)(Roberts, Charles) Modified on 11/21/2018 by correcting Motion type (las).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER DENYING without prejudice #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to establish good cause for the extension. If the parties seek to extend the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1) ("When an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires; or on motion made after the time has expired if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/20/2018. (jjm)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Definitive Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the First Amended Complaint)(Roberts, Charles)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Powerteq with Jury Demand. filed by Definitive Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New York Times article, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No 8,458,689, #3 Exhibit C - Product Manual) (Roberts, Charles)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Definitive Holdings as to Powerteq served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Roberts, Charles)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/30/2018. (las)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Definitive Holdings identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Roberts, Charles)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Powerteq. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Powerteq (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3134746) filed by Definitive Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New York Times article, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Pat. No. 8,458,689, #3 Exhibit C - Product Manual, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Roberts, Charles)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Definitive Holdings is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Definitive Holdings v. Powerteq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Definitive Holdings
Represented By: Charles L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerteq
Represented By: Mark O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?