Aggrey v. State of Utah

Plaintiff: Dominic Taban Aggrey
Defendant: State of Utah
Interested Party: SSA Notice
Case Number: 2:2018cv00904
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
0 Judge: Dale A Kimball
1 Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (nl)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to State of Utah. (nl)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/13/2018. (eat)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 After review of case, case reassigned to District Judge per 4 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Given the procedural posture of this case, consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge is not feasible. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/12/2018. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against State of Utah (Originally received by the court on 11/19/2018). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Dominic Taban Aggrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (nl)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/20/2018. (nl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 11/19/2018) filed by Plaintiff Dominic Taban Aggrey. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aggrey v. State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Taban Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?