Cisneros v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Morales Cisneros
Defendant: Estelle Unit, Prisoner Litigation Unit and Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Case Number: 2:2018cv00931
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT: paper documents received by USDC S Dist TX on 1/7/19 (alt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #1 Searchable copy of document) (jwt).
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to USDC Southern District of Texas via Electronic Transfer given case number 4:18-cv-04743. (rks)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Dismissing the case in this court and transferring action to USDC Southern District of TX. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/13/18 (alt)
December 17, 2018 Interdistrict Transfer to So TX. Record transferred to receiving court electronically (however pro se paper docs are being mailed separately). All future documents should be filed in USDC So District of TX Court - CASE CLOSED (alt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Rodolfo Morales Cisneros. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 12/04/2018) (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisneros v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estelle Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Morales Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?