Misinale v. Spencer et al
Plaintiff: Lopeti Taliauli Misinale
Defendant: Unified Taylorsville Police Department and Kevin Spencer
Case Number: 2:2018cv00937
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE-Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen (14) days from this date. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/30/19. (jmr)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 01/29/2019. (tdp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (jwt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Kevin Spencer, Unified Taylorsville Police Department. (jwt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Lopeti Taliauli Misinale. (jwt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Lopeti Taliauli Misinale, Defendants Kevin Spencer, Unified Taylorsville Police Department. Form due by 1/23/2019. (las)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Lopeti Taliauli Misinale, Defendants Kevin Spencer, Unified Taylorsville Police Department. (las)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kevin Spencer, Unified Taylorsville Police Department. Attorney R. Scott Young added to party Kevin Spencer(pty:dft), Attorney R. Scott Young added to party Unified Taylorsville Police Department(pty:dft)(Young, R.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Modification of Docket: Correction: Corrected the date of service and the answer due date. re #5 Summons Returned Executed. (las)
December 19, 2018 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Kevin Spencer answer due 1/7/2019. (las)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lopeti Taliauli Misinale as to Unified Taylorsville Police Department served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Sykes, Robert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lopeti Taliauli Misinale as to Kevin Spencer served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Sykes, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2018 by correcting date served and answer due date (las).
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Unified Taylorsville Police Department. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevin Spencer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3159489) filed by Lopeti Taliauli Misinale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Map, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Sykes, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Lopeti Taliauli Misinale is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misinale v. Spencer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lopeti Taliauli Misinale
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Taylorsville Police Department
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Spencer
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?