Kosti v. USA
Plaintiff: Kaden Stephan Kosti
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00956
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Mail sent to Kaden Stephan Kosti re docket entries #4 , #5 , Returned as Undeliverable/Moved Left No Address. No other address available - address record will be changed to NO ADDRESS. (alt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT LODGED consisting of single page received from K. Kosti Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (alt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Electronic Service of Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Kaden Stephan Kosti (Attachments: #1 E-Notice Reg Form) (alt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Kaden Stephan Kosti (alt)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that plaintiff's action is dismissed as frivolous with prejudice - CASE CLOSED; signed by ALT, Deputy Clerk (alt)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/20/18 (alt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against USA (Originally received by the court on 12/17/2018) filed by Kaden Stephan Kosti. (Fee Status: IFP) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (tlh)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/19/2018. (tlh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 12/17/2018) filed by Plaintiff Kaden Stephan Kosti. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kosti v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaden Stephan Kosti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?