Bagshaw v. Cottonwood Heights Police Dept et al
Plaintiff: Vickie Bagshaw
Defendant: Robert Russo, Ryan Shosted, Cottonwood Heights Police Dept, Emily Wood, Unified Police Department and Cottonwood Heights
Case Number: 2:2018cv00958
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Cottonwood Heights, Robert Russo, Ryan Shosted. Attorney Mary Ann Call May added to party Cottonwood Heights(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Ann Call May added to party Robert Russo(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Ann Call May added to party Ryan Shosted(pty:dft)(May, Mary Ann)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Cottonwood Heights. Removed Defendants: Cottonwood Heights Police Department. filed by Vickie Bagshaw. (Haymore, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Bagshaw as to Cottonwood Heights Police Dept served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(Haymore, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Bagshaw as to Emily Wood served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(Haymore, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Bagshaw as to Unified Police Department served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(Haymore, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Bagshaw as to Ryan Shosted served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons)(Haymore, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Bagshaw as to Robert Russo served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(Haymore, Jason)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Emily Wood. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ryan Shosted. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Russo. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Unified Police Department. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Cottonwood Heights Police Dept. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/20/2018. (las)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3168335) filed by Vickie Bagshaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet For Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Haymore, Jason)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Vickie Bagshaw is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagshaw v. Cottonwood Heights Police Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Russo
Represented By: Mary Ann Call May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Shosted
Represented By: Mary Ann Call May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottonwood Heights Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottonwood Heights
Represented By: Mary Ann Call May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Bagshaw
Represented By: Jason D. Haymore
Represented By: Zakia A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?