Freedman v. University of Utah

Plaintiff: Karen Freedman
Defendant: University of Utah
Case Number: 2:2019cv00010
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/23/19. (jlw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support , #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant University of Utah. (Balmanno, Alain)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 After review of case, case reassigned to District Judge per 12 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Plaintiff has filed #11 MOTION to Dismiss, which is ripe for decision. Because all parties have not yet consented to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 01/15/2019. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Karen Freedman. (las)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Acceptance of Service, #4 Notice of Removal) (las)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant University of Utah. (Balmanno, Alain)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant University of Utah. (las)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 01/07/2019. (kpf)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Karen Freedman, Defendant University of Utah. Form due by 1/22/2019. (tlh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Karen Freedman and Defendant University of Utah. (tlh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by University of Utah re #2 Notice of Removal, (Balmanno, Alain)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBITS filed by University of Utah re #2 Notice of Removal,. (Balmanno, Alain)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, County of Salt Lake, case number 180909160, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3175988) filed by University of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Acceptance of Service) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Balmanno, Alain)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant University of Utah is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedman v. University of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Utah
Represented By: Alain C. Balmanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?