Lopez v. Smith's Food and Drug

Plaintiff: Debbie Lopez
Defendant: Smith's Food and Drug and Smith's Food and Drug Centers
Case Number: 2:2019cv00034
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
0 Judge: Tena Campbell
1 Judge: Paul M Warner
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/15/2019. Expert Discovery due by 2/17/2020. Motions due by 3/16/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 03:00 PM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Tena Campbell. 3-Day Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Tena Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/23/19 (alt)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Party Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. as the named defendant in this case in place of Smiths Food and Drug dba Kroger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/23/19 (alt)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motion referred to Paul M. Warner. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/23/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Defendant Smith's Food and Drug. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edwards, Stephen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Edwards, Stephen)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/17/19 (alt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Debbie Lopez. (las)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Smith's Food and Drug. (las)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Debbie Lopez and Defendant Smith's Food and Drug. Form due by 1/30/2019. (tlh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Debbie Lopez and Defendant Smith's Food and Drug. (tlh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Smith's Food and Drug. (Edwards, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180909392, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3182713) filed by Smith's Food and Drug. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Edwards, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Defendant Smith's Food and Drug is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Smith's Food and Drug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Lopez
Represented By: Brian C. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food and Drug
Represented By: Stephen F. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food and Drug Centers
Represented By: Stephen F. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?