Battino v. Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah

Plaintiff: Michelle Battino
Defendant: Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah
Case Number: 2:2019cv00048
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
0 Judge: Dee Benson
1 Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Michelle Battino. (las)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah. (las)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Jackson Wisdom for Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/26/2019. (las) Modified by correcting aty name on 2/26/2019 (rks).
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Jackson Wisdom , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3211948, filed by Defendant Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Atkinson, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Michelle Battino, Defendant Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah. Form due by 3/4/2019. (las)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Michelle Battino, Defendant Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah. (las)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Reliance on Jury Demand filed by Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah. Attorney Ryan P. Atkinson added to party Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah(pty:dft)(Atkinson, Ryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Battino as to Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons)(Haymore, Jason)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 01/23/2019. (kpf)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3187684) filed by Michelle Battino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Richardson, Zakia)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Michelle Battino is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battino v. Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Battino
Represented By: Jason D. Haymore
Represented By: Zakia A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redi-Carpet Sales of Utah
Represented By: W. Jackson Wisdom
Represented By: Ryan P. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?