Chritson v. Goldman Sachs & Co

Plaintiff: David Chritson
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv00049
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 24 Modification of Docket: Correction: Attached approved minute entry. re #19 Status Report and Scheduling Conference. (kpf)
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by clerks office) Status Report and Scheduling Conference reset for 12/17/2019 at 01:15 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (las)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Continue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that further status and scheduling is reset for Tuesday, December 17, 2019, at 1:15 p.m. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 4/4/2019. (las)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2019. Discovery due by 12/1/2019. Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 01:15 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 4/2/2019. (las)
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference filed by Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (Burke, Paul)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Status Report and Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2019. Further, Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 01:15 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Attorney for Plaintiff: Austin B. Egan, Attorney for Defendant: Paul C. Burke, David B. Dibble. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken.(kpf) Modified to add text and image on 4/23/2019 (kpf).
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Egan, Austin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 Amended NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by clerks office) Status Report and Scheduling Conference reset for 3/27/2019 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (las)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue Status Report and Scheduling Conference. The status report and scheduling conference is set as follows 3/27/2019 at 1:20 pm courtroom 7.200. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 3/4/2019. (las)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Report and Scheduling Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff David Chritson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Goldman Sachs & Co.(Burke, Paul)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (las)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul C. Burke on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co (Burke, Paul)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff David Chritson. (las)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Goldman Sachs & Co answer due 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/5/2019. (las)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff David Chritson, Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. Form due by 2/20/2019. (las)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff David Chritson, Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (las)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney David B. Dibble added to party Goldman Sachs & Co(pty:dft)(Dibble, David) Modified on 2/5/2019 by correcting motion type. (las).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/24/2019. (kpf)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Goldman Sachs & Co. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Goldman Sachs & Co (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3188278) filed by David Chritson. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Egan, Austin)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff David Chritson is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chritson v. Goldman Sachs & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: Paul C. Burke
Represented By: David B. Dibble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chritson
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?