Edison et al v. USA

Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Edison and Leslie D. Edison
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00077
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison re #6 Order to Propose Schedule, #7 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven R. Anderson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3196294,, #5 Summons Issued Electronically, #4 Summons Issued Electronically, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Delivery Confirmation)(Anderson, Steven)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, (Anderson, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time Order to Propose Schedule. The court's Order to Propose Schedule (the #6 Order) is hereby amended as follows: The twenty-eight (28) days period in the Order is modified to sixty-seven (67) days after the United States was served (which is April 15, 2019); and the forty-two (42) days period is modified to eighty-one (81) days after service (which is April 29). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/7/2019. (jwt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time Order to Propose Schedule (Anderson, Steven)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time Order to Propose Schedule filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Steven)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison. (Anderson, Steven)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison. USA served on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Anderson, Steven)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven R. Anderson for Jeffrey S. Edison,Steven R. Anderson for Leslie D. Edison. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/5/2019. (las)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/5/2019. (las)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven R. Anderson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3196294, filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Andreasen, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against USA (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3196294) filed by Jeffrey S. Edison, Leslie D. Edison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Andreasen, Robert) Modified on 2/5/2019 by correcting the internet payment receipt number (tlh).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Jeffrey S. Edison and Leslie D. Edison are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edison et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Edison
Represented By: Robert D. Andreasen
Represented By: Steven R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie D. Edison
Represented By: Robert D. Andreasen
Represented By: Steven R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?