Butt v. PRA Health Sciences

Plaintiff: Yasir Q. Butt
Defendant: PRA Health Sciences
Case Number: 2:2019cv00131
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant PRA Health Sciences. (Kee, Conrad)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Yasir Q. Butt. (las)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #11 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by PRA Health Sciences.(Kee, Conrad)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Yasir Q. Butt, Defendant PRA Health Sciences. Form due by 4/4/2019. (las)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Yasir Q. Butt, Defendant PRA Health Sciences. (las)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER on Motion for Extension of Time signed by Anne W. Morgan. Answer deadline updated for PRA Health Sciences answer due 4/4/2019. (las)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant PRA Health Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kee, Conrad)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Conrad S. Kee on behalf of PRA Health Sciences (Kee, Conrad)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Christopher Moon on behalf of PRA Health Sciences (Moon, M.)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yasir Q. Butt as to PRA Health Sciences served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Court Issued Summons)(Richardson, Zakia)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/28/2019. (las)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to PRA Health Sciences. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against PRA Health Sciences (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3213527) filed by Yasir Q. Butt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Richardson, Zakia)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Yasir Q. Butt is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butt v. PRA Health Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRA Health Sciences
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasir Q. Butt
Represented By: Zakia A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?