Allen v. Ellsworth

Plaintiff: Kathryn G. Allen
Defendant: Jeff Ellsworth
Case Number: 2:2019cv00134
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Heather)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica N. Cepernich on behalf of Jeff Ellsworth (Cepernich, Danica)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Jeff Ellsworth. Attorney Heather S. White added to party Jeff Ellsworth(pty:dft)(White, Heather)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn G. Allen as to Jeff Ellsworth served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Sykes, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeff Ellsworth. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT & Jury Demand against Jeff Ellsworth (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3214052) filed by Kathryn G. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Complaint) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Sykes, Robert)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Kathryn G. Allen is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Ellsworth
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn G. Allen
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?