Bodyguard Productions v. Does 1-7
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions
Defendant: John Does 1-7
Case Number: 2:2019cv00139
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER taking under advisement #10 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Judgment As to Doe6 and #12 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Judgment As to Doe1 because Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions Inc. has not filed an amended complaint in accordance with the 9 Docket Text Order (filed March 12, 2019) or provided proof of service for each applicable defendant, including the complete address of each applicable defendant for purposes of service. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on April 22, 2019. No attached document. (elm)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Judgment as to Doe 1, Abdirisak Mohammed filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Signed Consent Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe 7, unidentified Defendant, without prejudice filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions (Zenger, Todd)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Judgment as to Doe 6 (IP 73.131.244.49), Leota Sagers filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Signed Consent Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDERIT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, upon obtaining the identifying, location, and contact information for the seven Doe defendants under the #8 Order Authorizing Limited Discovery, Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions Inc. must amend the #2 Complaint, substituting the Doe defendants with the applicable names and identifying information. This amended complaint must then be served on the identified defendants as provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.Signed by Judge David Nuffer on March 12, 2019. No attached document. (elm)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Expedite Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/4/19 (alt)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/1/2019. (jds)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt in Support re #5 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Expedite Discovery from ISPs filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Regional IP Data)(Zenger, Todd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Expedite Discovery from ISPs filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Subscriber Data, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge David Nuffer per General Order 18-007. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (rks)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (nl)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-7 (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3216124) filed by Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - IP Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Zenger, Todd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodyguard Productions v. Does 1-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions
Represented By: Todd E. Zenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?