Burgi v. Awolf Fitness

Plaintiff: Kristen Burgi
Defendant: Awolf Fitness
Case Number: 2:2019cv00151
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/3/2019. (las)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Awolf Fitness, Plaintiff Kristen Burgi. (las)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Kristen Burgi. (las)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Awolf Fitness. (las)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Awolf Fitness, Plaintiff Kristen Burgi. Form due by 5/1/2019. (las)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Awolf Fitness, Plaintiff Kristen Burgi. (las)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Awolf Fitness. Attorney Kurt W. Laird added to party Awolf Fitness(pty:dft)(Laird, Kurt)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Alex Caputo for Awolf Fitness, LLC dba Orange Theory Fitness on March 22, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Kristen Burgi. (Parkinson, Kenneth)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Awolf Fitness. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3218301) filed by Kristen Burgi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Parkinson, Kenneth)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Kristen Burgi is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgi v. Awolf Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Burgi
Represented By: Kenneth Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awolf Fitness
Represented By: Kurt W. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?