Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. v. Delta Stone Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd.
Defendant: Delta Stone Products
Case Number: 2:2019cv00208
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Clara B. Burns, for Defendant Delta Stone Products (jwt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Nicolas del Campo, for Plaintiff Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. (jwt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Kyle A. Zunker, Stephanie Lyn O'Rourke, for Plaintiff Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. (jwt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from USDC of Texas Western; Case Number 3:18-cv-00313. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells.
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Transfer Venue Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Mutually Agreed Extension of Deadlines by Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. (Zunker, Kyle) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/3/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, ADR Report Deadline due by 3/25/2019, ADR Mediation Completed by 10/25/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2019, Discovery due by 8/26/2019, Motions due by 9/26/2019,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd.. (Zunker, Kyle) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Report by Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd.. (Zunker, Kyle) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Designation of Local Counsel by Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. (Zunker, Kyle) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
February 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #16 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PRM) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Report Deadline by Delta Stone Products, Inc.. (Savage, Greggory) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Delta Stone Products, Inc., re #3 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Delta Stone Products, Inc. (Roberts, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 Fed Ex Delivery Receipt of #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 Fed Ex Delivery Receipt of #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd., re #3 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Delta Stone Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zunker, Kyle) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 Fed Ex Mail Receipt of #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 Fed Ex Mail Receipt of #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory S. Roberts for Delta Stone Products, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Greggory J. Savage for Delta Stone Products, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. RETAIN local counsel no event later than February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must confer with Defendant, to JOINTLY FILE a PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by February 22, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall, separateand apart from the Proposed Scheduling Order, JOINTLY FILE theCASE MANAGEMENT REPORT no later than February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory S. Roberts ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 300033262). (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Greggory J. Savage ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 300033263). (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Delta Stone Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), #4 Exhibit 1 (Part 4), #5 Proposed Order)(Burns, Clara) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. as to Delta Stone Products, Inc.. Waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Zunker, Kyle) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
October 19, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (bg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11364895). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd..(Zunker, Kyle) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd. v. Delta Stone Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Stone Products
Represented By: Gregory S. Roberts
Represented By: Greggory J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shadrock & Williams Masonry, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?