DiTucci et al v. Ashby et al
Case Number: 2:2019cv00277
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 145 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions: additionally, Defendants' request for attorneys' fees incurred in opposing the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/18/20 (alt)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 139 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Dismiss - granted for the tenth and seventeenth causes of action and otherwise denied. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 3/16/20 (alt)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: granted as to the fifth and seventeenth causes of action and denied as to the fourth, fifteenth, and sixteenth causes of action. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/27/20 (alt)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 26 Plaintiffs Expedited Emergency Verified Motion for Ex Parte Prejudgment Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 6/24/2019. (jds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiTucci et al v. Ashby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?