Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Progrexion Marketing et al
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Defendant: Creditrepair.com, Efolks, Progrexion Marketing, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Teleservices, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC and John C Heath Attorney At Law PLLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00298
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:5531
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Creditrepair.com answer due 3/10/2020; Efolks answer due 3/10/2020; John C Heath Attorney At Law PLLC answer due 3/10/2020; PGX Holdings answer due 3/10/2020; Progrexion Marketing answer due 3/10/2020; Progrexion Teleservices answer due 3/10/2020. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 2/20/2020. (las)
February 20, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Karra)
February 18, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
February 18, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #50 Plaintiff's Short Form Discovery MOTION: Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying #30 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 2/18/20. (jmr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBE Group v. Heath - Memorandum Opinion and Order) (Porter, Karra)
December 26, 2019 Filing 53 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on December 13, 2019 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/25/2020. (jmr)
December 13, 2019 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2019 re #30 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Efolks, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices, PGX Holdings, Creditrepair.com, John C Heath Attorney At Law PLLC. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kevin E. Friedl, Maureen E. McOwen, Jonthan H. Reischl, Attorney for Defendant: Thomas M. Hefferon, Karra J. Porter, W. Kyle Tayman. Court Reporter: Ed Young.(kpf) Modified to add approved image and text on 2/19/2020 (kpf).
December 11, 2019 Filing 51 Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re #50 Plaintiff's MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Production of Documents MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiff's Short Form Discovery Motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Porter, Karra)
December 4, 2019 Filing 50 Plaintiff's MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Production of Documents , MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiff's Short Form Discovery Motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #3 Exhibit 2 - PGX Holdings' Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit 3 - Progrexion Company Defendants' Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit 4 - 10/31/19 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to Defense Counsel re Discovery, #6 Exhibit 5 - 11/20/19 Letter from Defense Counsel to Plaintiff's Counsel re Discovery, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilmer, Tracy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of grant of certiorari in Seila Law LLC v CFPB, No. 19-7 (S. Ct.) by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Friedl, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #30 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint : Motion Hearing is re-set for 12/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
October 2, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING set for 10/8/2019, 10:00 AM before Judge Jenkins. (To be rescheduled at a later date. Amended Notice of Hearing to follow.) (kms)
September 24, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Porter, Karra)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION AND LEAVE TO FILE A FURTHER OVERLENGTH REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT - granting #44 Motion for Leave to File Further Overlength Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/19/19. (jmr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File a Further Overlength Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrington, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of change in the Bureau's position regarding the constitutionality of the for-cause removal provision in the Consumer Financial Protection Act by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Attachments: #1 Solicitor General's Brief in Seila Law v. CFPB, No. 19-7 (S. Ct.)) (Friedl, Kevin)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OVERLENGTH REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT - granting #41 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants may file a reply containing a total of fifteen pages. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/16/19. (jmr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File An Overlength Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrington, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Friedl on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Friedl, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #30 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
September 11, 2019 Filing 38 ERRATA to #36 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Corrected))(McOwen, Maureen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #30 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
August 30, 2019 Filing 36 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McOwen, Maureen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy L. Hilmer on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Hilmer, Tracy)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OVERLENGTH RESPONSE TODEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS- granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/20/19. (jmr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 33 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McOwen, Maureen)
July 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/30/2019. Replies due by 9/20/2019. (kpf)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is August 30, 2019, and Defendants' deadline to reply to plaintiffs response is September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 07/26/2019. (kpf)
July 26, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply Briefs to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McOwen, Maureen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Porter, Karra)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Motion. Defendants may file a motion containing a total of 32 pages. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 7/17/19. (jmr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File an Overlength Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Overlength Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof)(Porter, Karra)
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (McOwen, Maureen)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Creditrepair.com answer due 7/19/2019; Efolks answer due 7/19/2019; John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC answer due 7/19/2019; PGX Holdings answer due 7/19/2019; Progrexion Marketing answer due 7/19/2019; Progrexion Teleservices answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/25/2019. (las)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (las)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Compliant)(Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant PGX Holdings identifying H.I.G. Progrexion, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Creditrepair.com identifying PGX Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Efolks identifying PGX Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Progrexion Marketing identifying PGX Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Progrexion Teleservices identifying PGX Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Kyle Tayman for Creditrepair.com,W. Kyle Tayman for Efolks,W. Kyle Tayman for John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC,W. Kyle Tayman for PGX Holdings,W. Kyle Tayman for Progrexion Marketing,W. Kyle Tayman for Progrexion Teleservices. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/21/2019. (las)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Hefferon for Creditrepair.com,Thomas M. Hefferon for Efolks,Thomas M. Hefferon for John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC,Thomas M. Hefferon for PGX Holdings,Thomas M. Hefferon for Progrexion Marketing,Thomas M. Hefferon for Progrexion Teleservices. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/21/2019. (las)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William J. Harrington for Creditrepair.com,William J. Harrington for Efolks,William J. Harrington for John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC,William J. Harrington for PGX Holdings,William J. Harrington for Progrexion Marketing,William J. Harrington for Progrexion Teleservices. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/21/2019. (las)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. Form due by 7/8/2019. (las)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (las)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Kyle Tayman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3307438, filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William J. Harrington , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3307427, filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Hefferon , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3307419, filed by Defendants Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Porter, Karra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karra J. Porter on behalf of Creditrepair.com, Efolks, John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC, PGX Holdings, Progrexion Marketing, Progrexion Teleservices (Porter, Karra)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection as to All Defendants. (Reischl, Jonathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (las)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/3/2019. (las)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H. Reischl on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Reischl, Jonathan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. McOwen on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (McOwen, Maureen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (McOwen, Maureen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Progrexion Marketing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creditrepair.com
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: William J. Harrington
Represented By: W. Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efolks
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: William J. Harrington
Represented By: W. Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progrexion Marketing
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: William J. Harrington
Represented By: W. Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PGX Holdings
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: William J. Harrington
Represented By: W. Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progrexion Teleservices
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: William J. Harrington
Represented By: W. Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Heath Attorney At Law PLLC
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: William J. Harrington
Represented By: W. Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Heath Attorney At Law PLLC
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: William J. Harrington
Represented By: W. Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Represented By: Maureen E. McOwen
Represented By: Jonathan H. Reischl
Represented By: Tracy L. Hilmer
Represented By: Kevin E. Friedl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?