S. v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Christina S.
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company and Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00304
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean P. Nalty , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3314243, filed by Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Audrey S. Olson added to party CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)(Olson, Audrey)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie O. Zorn for Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/1/2019. (eat)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey S. Olson on behalf of Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan (Olson, Audrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie O. Zorn , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3312636, filed by Defendant Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Audrey S. Olson added to party Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft)(Olson, Audrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christina S. as to CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company Waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (King, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christina S. as to Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan Waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (King, Brian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan, CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3266945) filed by Christina S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (King, Brian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Christina S. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina S.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Audrey S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Stephanie O. Zorn
Represented By: Audrey S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?