Architectural Nexus v. Kling Stubbins Inc et al

Plaintiff: Architectural Nexus
Defendant: American Arbitration Association and Kling Stubbins Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00308
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Architectural Nexus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kling Stubbins, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Joinder, #2 Exhibit Decision on Objection to Joinder)(Coburn, Craig)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Kling Stubbins Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teaming Agreement)(Brown, S.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Architectural Nexus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Mark A. Davis, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Douglas A. Thimm, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Craig C. Coburn)(Coburn, Craig)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Kling Stubbins Inc. (Brown, S.)
May 17, 2019 Deadlines/Hearings terminated. SEE ORDER #14 (reb)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. Application for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.300. The Temporary Restraining Order previously issued by the state court in this matter and extended by this court through Monday, May 20, 2019, is hereby further extended through the date the Court rules on Nexus's Amended Application for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/16/2019. (mas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support Extending Temporary Restraining Order; Setting Briefing Schedule; Setting Hearing filed by Plaintiff Architectural Nexus. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Craig)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Kling Stubbins Inc answer due 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/13/2019. (mas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Answer of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Kling Stubbins Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extending Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint)(Brown, S.) Modified event on 5/13/2019 (mas).
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING of State Court Dockets re #2 Notice of Removal from Third District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket)(mas)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, the Temporary Restraining Order previously issued by the state court in this matter is hereby extended through Monday, May 20, 2019, at which time it will expire of its own accord unless terminated earlier by order of this Court. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/7/2019. (jds)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Architectural Nexus and Defendant Kling Stubbins Inc. (tlh)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 After review of the case, case reassigned to a District Judge per 4 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support , Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Architectural Nexus. (Coburn, Craig)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDERFOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. The filing of #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order renders this matter ineligible for magistrate assignment. Accordingly, the undersigned orders that this matter be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/6/19. (mjw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Architectural Nexus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Application for TRO, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 2-3, #6 Exhibit 2-4, #7 Exhibit 2-5, #8 Exhibit 2-6, #9 Exhibit 2-7, #10 Exhibit 3, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Craig) Modified on 5/8/2019 (mas).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3267290) filed by Kling Stubbins Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Fitts, Stanford)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Defendant Kling Stubbins Inc is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Architectural Nexus v. Kling Stubbins Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arbitration Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kling Stubbins Inc
Represented By: Stanford P. Fitts
Represented By: S. Spencer Brown
Represented By: Jessica J. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural Nexus
Represented By: John Edward Keiter, Jr.
Represented By: Craig C. Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?