Custom Lighting Services et al v. Bleak

Plaintiff: Custom Lighting Services and B&M Energy & Infrastructure
Defendant: James Bleak
Case Number: 2:2019cv00313
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Without Prejudice: Pursuant to the parties' #14 "Stipulated Motion to Vacate May 29th Hearing and Stay Motion for Temporary Restraining Order," this court entered an #15 order vacating the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and staying the Motion. The stay expired on June 28, 2019. No party has moved to continue the stay, and no party has asked the court to reschedule a hearing on the Motion. The Motion is accordingly DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/1/19. (dla)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Vacating May 29th Hearing and Staying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: The hearing currently scheduled for May 29, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. on #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is VACATED, and that the Motion for TRO is stayed for thirty (30) days, through and including Friday, 6/28/2019. If either party wishes to lift the stay prior to that time, the party may email the court to schedule a status conference. Additionally, the time for Defendant to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is hereby extended indefinitely. Plaintiffs may move for the court to terminate this extension. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/24/19. (dla)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Vacate 12 Status Conference,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, and Memorandum in Support and Stay Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs B&M Energy & Infrastructure, Custom Lighting Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tolk, Bentley)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/14/2019. (mjm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/10/2019. The court set the following deadlines - Plaintiff's Reply is due 5/13/2019, along with any addition declarations and identification of trade secrets. Defendant to file Response by 5/15/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby, re: as to #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney for Plaintiff: Rodger Burge, Attorney for Defendant: Zack Winzeler. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken.(mjm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant James Bleak. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Bleak Submitted in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Winzeler, Zack)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Robert J. Shelby. As a participant, the conference instructions are as follows: 1. Dial 888-808-6929 ; 2. Enter Access Code 2900331 ; 3. To enter as a participant, press # key. If the call has not been activated by the Court, you will be placed on hold. If you have any questions before the hearing begins, please do not hesitate to call chambers at 801-524-6790, if you are having issues during the hearing, please email the case administrator at mary_jane_mcnamee@utd.uscourts.gov (mjm) (mjm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 After review of the case, case reassigned to a District Judge per 8 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Based upon the Plaintiff's filing of a #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/9/2019. (lnp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs B&M Energy & Infrastructure, Custom Lighting Services. NOTE: Motion originally filed in State Court on 4/26/2019. (las)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Motion for TRO, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Returned summons, #5 Notice of Removal, #6 Minute Entry, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (las)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs B&M Energy & Infrastructure, Custom Lighting Services, Defendant James Bleak. Form due by 5/24/2019. (tlh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs B&M Energy & Infrastructure, Custom Lighting Services and Defendant James Bleak. (tlh)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/9/2019. (las)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190903430, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3269865) filed by James Bleak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit C - May 7, 2019 email from plaintiff's counsel) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Langton, Derek)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendant James Bleak is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Custom Lighting Services et al v. Bleak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Custom Lighting Services
Represented By: Bentley J. Tolk
Represented By: Rodger Moore Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&M Energy & Infrastructure
Represented By: Bentley J. Tolk
Represented By: Rodger Moore Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bleak
Represented By: Derek Langton
Represented By: Zack L. Winzeler
Represented By: Alissa M. Mellem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?