Bodyguard Productions v. Avanesyan, et al.
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions
Defendant: Internet Subscribers 1-7, Keri Deros, Kristia Le Miles, Sean Kahlke, Armani Gariki Avanesyan, Barbara Carrillo, Pamelia Poen and Hector German
Case Number: 2:2019cv00345
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT/PERMANENT INJUNCTION entered against Arman Gariki Avanesyan #9 , granting Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/10/19 (alt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kristia Le Miles. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Keri Deros. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Hector German. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sean Kahlke. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pamelia Poen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Barbara Carrillo. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Armani Gariki Avanesyan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Judgment as to Arman Gariki Avanesyan, Internet Subscriber 1 (IP 98.202.120.52) filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Signed Consent Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internet Subscribers 1-7 with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Armani Gariki Avanesyan, Barbara Carrillo, Pamelia Poen, Sean Kahlke, Hector German, Keri Deros, Kristia Le Miles. Removed Defendants: Internet Subscribers 1-7. filed by Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - IP Information) (Zenger, Todd)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/16/19 (alt)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/16/19 (alt)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (nl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt in Support re #3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Regional IP Data)(Zenger, Todd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Subscriber Data, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Internet Subscribers 1-7 (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3277100) filed by Bodyguard Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - IP Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Zenger, Todd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodyguard Productions v. Avanesyan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions
Represented By: Todd E. Zenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Subscribers 1-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri Deros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristia Le Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Kahlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armani Gariki Avanesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamelia Poen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?