Vicidiem et al v. Christensen et al

Plaintiff: Craig Hutchinson and Vicidiem
Defendant: Fiberwave Technologies and Paul Christensen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00358
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kent R. Christensen for Paul Christensen, Fiberwave Technologies. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/26/2019. (jwt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kent R. Christensen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3309832, filed by Defendants Paul Christensen, Fiberwave Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Christensen, Roger)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Paul Christensen, Fiberwave Technologies identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Christensen, Roger)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Paul Christensen, Fiberwave Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Agreement)(Christensen, Roger)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Paul Christensen, Fiberwave Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Roger P. Christensen added to party Paul Christensen(pty:dft), Attorney Roger P. Christensen added to party Fiberwave Technologies(pty:dft)(Christensen, Roger)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vicidiem as to Fiberwave Technologies served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Miller, Blake)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vicidiem as to Paul Christensen served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Miller, Blake)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Fiberwave Technologies. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Paul Christensen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3282052) filed by Vicidiem, Craig Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Scott, Jared)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiffs Craig Hutchinson and Vicidiem are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vicidiem et al v. Christensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiberwave Technologies
Represented By: Roger P. Christensen
Represented By: Kent R. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Christensen
Represented By: Roger P. Christensen
Represented By: Kent R. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Hutchinson
Represented By: Blake D. Miller
Represented By: Jared D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicidiem
Represented By: Blake D. Miller
Represented By: Jared D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?