Growgenix Solutions LLC et al v. Roberts International Agricultural Development et al

Plaintiff: Nu Skin Enterprises, Growgenix Solutions LLC and Grow Solutions Tech
Defendant: Roberts International Agricultural Development, Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing and Roberts Dairy
Case Number: 2:2019cv00359
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Evelyn J Furse
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION (Stipulated) Motion to Postpone the Submission of the Attorney Planning Meeting Report re #16 Order to Propose Schedule, filed by Defendants Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Burton, James)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiffs must propose a schedule to defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen (14) days. Within twenty-one (21) days, the parties shall meet and confer. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/12/2019. (jds)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/12/2019. No attached document. (nas)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/12/2019. (reb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 After review of case, Case Reassigned to District Judge per docket text order 12. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the pending Motion to Dismiss #9 consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge is not feasible at this time. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random assignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/3/19. (jfm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #9 Redacted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural DevelopmentNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #9 Redacted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Redacted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 10,034,434, #2 Exhibit B - Patent No. US 20180362272, #3 Exhibit C - Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D - Covenant Not to Sue)(Burton, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Wahlquist on behalf of Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development (Wahlquist, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Schofield on behalf of Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development (Schofield, Peter)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Eixenberger on behalf of Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development (Eixenberger, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Burton on behalf of Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development (Burton, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:19-cv-00359-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Don Roberts, Roberts Consulting & Marketing, Roberts Dairy, Roberts International Agricultural Development (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3282193) filed by Grow Solutions Tech, Growgenix Solutions LLC, Nu Skin Enterprises. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Pehrson, Chad)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs Grow Solutions Tech, Growgenix Solutions LLC and Nu Skin Enterprises is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Growgenix Solutions LLC et al v. Roberts International Agricultural Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts International Agricultural Development
Represented By: Michael A. Eixenberger
Represented By: David M. Wahlquist
Represented By: Peter C. Schofield
Represented By: James T. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Roberts
Represented By: Michael A. Eixenberger
Represented By: David M. Wahlquist
Represented By: Peter C. Schofield
Represented By: James T. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Consulting & Marketing
Represented By: Michael A. Eixenberger
Represented By: David M. Wahlquist
Represented By: Peter C. Schofield
Represented By: James T. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Dairy
Represented By: Michael A. Eixenberger
Represented By: David M. Wahlquist
Represented By: Peter C. Schofield
Represented By: James T. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nu Skin Enterprises
Represented By: Austin J. Riter
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Chad S. Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Growgenix Solutions LLC
Represented By: Austin J. Riter
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Chad S. Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grow Solutions Tech
Represented By: Austin J. Riter
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Chad S. Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?