Rufus v. Pacificorp et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Rufus
Defendant: Pacificorp and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 57
Case Number: 2:2019cv00377
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 57, Pacificorp, Plaintiff Stephen Rufus. Form due by 8/9/2019. (nl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Panico, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 PacifiCorp ANSWER to Complaint filed by Pacificorp. Attorney Emily L. Wegener added to party Pacificorp(pty:dft)(Wegener, Emily)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Strindberg on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 57 (Strindberg, Erik)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 57.(Thorne, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan K. Thorne on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 57 (Thorne, Jonathan)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/31/2019. (las)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 57. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pacificorp. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Panico on behalf of Stephen Rufus (Panico, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3287174) filed by Stephen Rufus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Panico, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Stephen Rufus is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rufus v. Pacificorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificorp
Represented By: Emily L. Wegener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 57
Represented By: Erik Strindberg
Represented By: Jonathan K. Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Rufus
Represented By: John R. Panico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?