Symbology Innovations v. doTerra Holdings

Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations
Defendant: doTerra Holdings
Case Number: 2:2019cv00391
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Civil Case Terminated, per Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #15 . (nl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations (Vidal-Font, Jean)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for doTerra Holdings answer due 8/19/2019. Plaintiff, Symbology Innovations, LLC, shall have fourteen (14) days from August 19, 2019, to send doTERRAs litigation counsel a proposed Attorney Planning Meeting Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/18/2019. (las)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, as to doTerra Holdings until and including August 19, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vidal-Font, Jean)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for doTerra Holdings answer due 7/22/2019. Plaintiff, Symbology Innovations, LLC, shall have fourteen (14) days from 7/22/2019 to send doTERRA's litigation counsel a proposed Attorney Planning Meeting Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/2/2019. (nl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Hill, Gordon)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/24/2019. (las)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for In Person Summons and Complaint served on Cassidy Gilman on June 8, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations. (Hill, Gordon)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jean G. Vidal-Font for Symbology Innovations. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/19/2019. (las)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola for Symbology Innovations. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/19/2019. (las)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jean G. Vidal-Font , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3303778, filed by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B: ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order )(Hill, Gordon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3303721, filed by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B: ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order )(Hill, Gordon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to doTerra Holdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against doTerra Holdings (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3291995) filed by Symbology Innovations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 8,424,752, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Hill, Gordon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Symbology Innovations is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations v. doTerra Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: doTerra Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations
Represented By: Gordon K. Hill
Represented By: Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola
Represented By: Jean G. Vidal-Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?