Brown v. Marriott International et al
Plaintiff: Robert Louis Brown
Defendant: Arne Sornsen, Bill Marriot, Jr and Marriott International
Case Number: 2:2019cv00403
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Moss, Jr on behalf of Marriott International (Moss, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Marriott International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 6 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit 7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Hughes, Rhianna)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Marriott International. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Hughes, Rhianna)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Marriott International. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/13/2019. (eat)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill Marriot, Jr, Marriott International, Arne Sornsen (Originally received by the court on 06/12/2019). (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681086657) (Fee Status: PAID) filed by Robert Louis Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Marriott International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arne Sornsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Marriot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International
Represented By: James R. Moss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Louis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?