Coleman v. Ally Bank
Plaintiff: Christopher Coleman
Defendant: Ally Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv00406
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to propose schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/7/2019. (las)
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Propose Schedule filed by Defendant Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Kearl, J.)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/1/2019. (las)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Christopher Coleman. (nl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Ally Bank. (nl)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Ostrow for Christopher Coleman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/10/2019. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 ADDENDUM to #11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Ostrow , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3318298, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Coleman . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application and Registration)(Wahlquist, Adam)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Ally Bank, Plaintiff Christopher Coleman. Form due by 7/25/2019. (nl)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Ally Bank answer due 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/8/2019. (nl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 ADDENDUM to #11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Ostrow , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3318298, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Coleman includes the appication and ECF registration for Jeff Ostrow. (Wahlquist, Adam) Modified on 7/9/2019 ECF registration not attached, counsel to email registration to ut_support@utd.uscourts.gov (nl).
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Ostrow , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3318298, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wahlquist, Adam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine J. Benard on behalf of Ally Bank (Benard, Blaine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney J. Derek Kearl added to party Ally Bank(pty:dft)(Kearl, J.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for personal served on Kathy Richmond Asst to RA on 06/20/19, filed by Defendant Ally Bank., **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Coleman as to Ally Bank served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Wahlquist, Adam)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ally Bank. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/14/2019. (las)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Hassan A. Zavareei Andrea and R. Gold, for Plaintiff Christopher Coleman. (tlh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeff Ostrow, Daniel Tropin and Jonathan Streisfeld, for Plaintiff Christopher Coleman. (tlh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeffrey D. Kaliel and Sophia Goren Gold, for Plaintiff Christopher Coleman. (tlh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Proposed Class Action and Demand or Jury Trial against Ally Bank (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3300535) filed by Christopher Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - On-line Checking Account, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - On-line Savings Account, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Deposit Agreement) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Wahlquist, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Christopher Coleman is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Blaine J. Benard
Represented By: J. Derek Kearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Coleman
Represented By: Adam D. Wahlquist
Represented By: David M. Wahlquist
Represented By: Jeff Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?