Richards et al v. C&C Sheet Metal et al
Plaintiff: Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Ian McKelvie, Tony Ericksen, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Sterling Jensen, Chad Bunting, Brennan Cochran, Stephen Richards, Blair Halverson, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Troy Bonner and Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: C&C Sheet Metal, Casey Jones, Sr and Casey Jones, Jr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00418
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Babcock on behalf of C&C Sheet Metal (Babcock, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jon H. Rogers filed by Defendant Casey Jones, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Client Written Consent for Withdrawal of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Jon)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups per 17 docket text order. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Plaintiffs have filed #16 Notice of Settlement Stipulated Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment Against C&C Sheet Metal, which is ripe for decision. Because all defendants have not yet entered an appearance, consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge by all parties is not feasible at this point in time. Accordingly, Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 08/15/2019. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement Stipulated Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment Against C&C Sheet Metal by Troy Bonner, Chad Bunting, Brennan Cochran, Tony Ericksen, Blair Halverson, Sterling Jensen, Ian McKelvie, Stephen Richards, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund (Grimes, Kenneth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint,, filed by Casey Jones, Sr. Attorney James D. Gilson added to party Casey Jones, Sr(pty:dft)(Gilson, James)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Casey Jones, Jr. answer due 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/18/2019. (las)
July 13, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Troy Bonner, Chad Bunting, Brennan Cochran, Tony Ericksen, Blair Halverson, Sterling Jensen, Ian McKelvie, Stephen Richards, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund. (Grimes, Kenneth)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Casey Jones, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Rogers, Jon)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon H. Rogers on behalf of Casey Jones, Sr (Rogers, Jon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian McKelvie, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Blair Halverson, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund, Stephen Richards, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Chad Bunting, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Troy Bonner, Sterling Jensen, Brennan Cochran, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund, Tony Ericksen as to Casey Jones, Sr served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Grimes, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian McKelvie, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Blair Halverson, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund, Stephen Richards, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Chad Bunting, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Troy Bonner, Sterling Jensen, Brennan Cochran, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund, Tony Ericksen as to Casey Jones, Jr served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Grimes, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian McKelvie, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Blair Halverson, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund, Stephen Richards, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Chad Bunting, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Troy Bonner, Sterling Jensen, Brennan Cochran, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund, Tony Ericksen as to C&C Sheet Metal served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Grimes, Kenneth)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/20/2019. (las)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Casey Jones, Sr. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Casey Jones, Jr. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to C&C Sheet Metal. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Ian McKelvie, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Blair Halverson, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund, Stephen Richards, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Chad Bunting, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Troy Bonner, Sterling Jensen, Brennan Cochran, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund, Tony Ericksen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1 -2005 CBA, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2 -2005 CBA, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Signature Pages, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Recognition Agreement), #5 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 1 -2016 CBA, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 2 - 2016 CBA) (Grimes, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3304321) filed by Ian McKelvie, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Blair Halverson, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund, Stephen Richards, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Chad Bunting, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Troy Bonner, Sterling Jensen, Brennan Cochran, Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund, Tony Ericksen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Grimes, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Troy Bonner, Chad Bunting, Brennan Cochran, Tony Ericksen, Blair Halverson, Sterling Jensen, Ian McKelvie, Stephen Richards, Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312, Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund, Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fun and Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards et al v. C&C Sheet Metal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&C Sheet Metal
Represented By: Robert F. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Jones, Sr
Represented By: James D. Gilson
Represented By: Jon H. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Sheet Metal Contractors Industry Fund
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian McKelvie
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ericksen
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Sheet Metal Education and Training Fund
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Jensen
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Bunting
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brennan Cochran
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Richards
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair Halverson
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Sheet Metal Vacation and Holiday Fund
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Sheet Metal Market Recovery Fund
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 312
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Bonner
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Sheet Metal Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grimes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?