TopMostAwards v. Topmost World
Plaintiff: TopMostAwards
Defendant: Topmost World
Case Number: 2:2019cv00426
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/24/2019. (jds)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed against the plaintiff, TopMostAwards. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected. re #2 Complaint,. (tlh)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/20/2019. (tco)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Topmost World (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3306454) filed by TopMostAwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Clayton, Grant) Modified on 6/21/2019 by correcting who the Complaint was filed against (tlh).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff TopMostAwards is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TopMostAwards v. Topmost World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topmost World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TopMostAwards
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Call
Represented By: Grant R Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?