Gillespie v. NAR Inc
Plaintiff: Lisa Gillespie
Defendant: NAR Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00439
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to NAR Inc., doing business as North American Recovery. (nl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Lisa Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Jared) Modified by changing event type to motion for entry of default on 7/22/2019 (eat).
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Gillespie as to NAR Inc served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Pearson, Jared)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/25/2019. (eat)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to NAR Inc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NAR Inc (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3308669) filed by Lisa Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Pearson, Jared)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Lisa Gillespie is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie v. NAR Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAR Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Gillespie
Represented By: Jared B. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?