AlexSam v. HealthEquity

Plaintiff: AlexSam
Defendant: HealthEquity
Case Number: 2:2019cv00445
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint filed by Defendant HealthEquity. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Christopher B. Hadley added to party HealthEquity(pty:dft)(Hadley, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven W. Ritcheson for AlexSam. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/15/2019. (nl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven W. Ritcheson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3349234, filed by Plaintiff AlexSam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - ECF Registration)(Cataxinos, Edgar)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Lee Gresham, III for AlexSam. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/14/2019. (nl)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline K. Burt for AlexSam. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/14/2019. (nl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Lee Gresham, III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3348080, filed by Plaintiff AlexSam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lee, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - ECF Registration)(Cataxinos, Edgar)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline K. Burt , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3348066, filed by Plaintiff AlexSam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - ECF Registration)(Cataxinos, Edgar)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff AlexSam. (Cataxinos, Edgar)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by AlexSam as to HealthEquity served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Cataxinos, Edgar)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to HealthEquity. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/28/2019. (las)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Steven W. Ritcheson, for Plaintiff AlexSam. (nl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney W. Lee Gresham III and Timothy C. Davis, for Plaintiff AlexSam. (nl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jacqueline K. Burt, Jonathan R. Miller and Travis E. Lynch, for Plaintiff AlexSam. (nl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against HealthEquity (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3310440) filed by AlexSam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 6,000,608, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Declaration Of Ivan Zatkovich, #3 Exhibit C - Infringement Analysis, #4 Exhibit D - Notice Letter dated June 9, 2015, #5 Exhibit E - July 16, 2015 Letter Response, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Dkt #1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Cataxinos, Edgar)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff AlexSam is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AlexSam v. HealthEquity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AlexSam
Represented By: Edgar R. Cataxinos
Represented By: Steven W. Ritcheson
Represented By: W. Lee Gresham, III
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthEquity
Represented By: Christopher B. Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?