Onyx Graphics v. Onnyx LLC
Plaintiff: Onyx Graphics
Defendant: Onnyx LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00448
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jds)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE per #9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/16/2019. (jds)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Onyx Graphics (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Duke, Clinton)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/17/2019. (jds)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/16/19. (ss)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/16/19. (ss)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onyx Graphics as to Onnyx LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Duke, Clinton)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Onnyx LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Onnyx LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3310890) filed by Onyx Graphics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Duke, Clinton)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Onyx Graphics is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onyx Graphics v. Onnyx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyx Graphics
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onnyx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?