Joe Hand Promotions v. Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions
Defendant: Grumpy and Jose Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2019cv00476
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julie Cohen Lonstein for Joe Hand Promotions. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/15/2019. (las)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/9/2019. (nl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (tlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Grumpy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joe Hand Promotions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions. (Langford, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julie Cohen Lonstein , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3318465, filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application)(Langford, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3318450) filed by Joe Hand Promotions. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Langford, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grumpy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions
Represented By: Michael J. Langford
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?