Thompson v. Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Torry Thompson
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc. and Lowes Companies
Case Number: 2:2019cv00478
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Motions due by 8/14/2020. Status Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/26/2019. (las)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/23/2019. (las)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Torry Thompson. (nl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE VACATING Initial Pretrial Conference HEARING set for 9/3/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Notice generated by EJF Chambers). (lnp)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Lanier for Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., and Lowes Home Centers. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/21/2019. (nl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Lowes Home Centers. (nl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Lowes Home Centers, Plaintiff Torry Thompson. Form due by 9/5/2019. (nl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Lanier , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3354171, filed by Defendants Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Lowes Home Centers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Spencer, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 03:00 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/16/2019. No attached document. (lnp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Lowes Home Centers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spencer, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Spencer, Sarah)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Order to Propose Schedule #6 within fourteen (14) days. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/2/2019. (nas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Lowes Home Centers.(Spencer, Sarah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc..(Spencer, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/9/2019. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Returned Summons Lowe's Home Centers, #3 Returned Summons Black & Decker, #4 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Lowes Home Centers and Plaintiff Torry Thompson. (tlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190904585, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3318748) filed by Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Lowes Home Centers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons on Black & Decker, #3 Exhibit C - Summons on Lowe's Home Centers, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Removal in State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Spencer, Sarah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Modification of Docket: Error: Filing Instructions were docketed for filing a Complaint. Correction: Docket text has been corrected and parties notified of the error. Defendants should be filing a Notice of Removal not a Complaint. re #1 Remark - New Case. (tlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendants Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc. and Lowes Home Centers are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) Modified on 7/8/2019 by correcting the docket text. Defendants should file the Notice of Removal, not Complaint (tlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers
Represented By: Sarah E. Spencer
Represented By: Bryson R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel R. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Spencer
Represented By: Bryson R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel R. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torry Thompson
Represented By: Christopher J. Cheney
Represented By: Lance L. Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?