Kathan v. Autovest
Plaintiff: Wayland Kathan
Defendant: Autovest
Case Number: 2:2019cv00486
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 Motions No Longer Referred: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support will be handled by the District Judge. (jfm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Autovest. (Campbell, R.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Autovest. (Campbell, R.)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/30/2019. (jds)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Wayland Kathan. (Baczynski, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responsive Memorandum due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/16/2019. (jds)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Wayland Kathan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Baczynski, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motion referred to Cecilia M. Romero. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/2/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Autovest. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Don Griffin, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Kimberlee Basha, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, R.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Autovest. (Campbell, R.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 , #5 ) filed by Autovest. (Campbell, R.)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Travis Campbell for Autovest. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/16/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tomio B. Narita for Autovest. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/16/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Travis Campbell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3325293, filed by Defendant Autovest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order C)(Constantino, Gregory)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 File Downloaded from XChangeWEB for 3rd District Court, SL County, consisting of copies of docket sheet and documents filed in state court (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Ntc of Appearance, #3 State Court Ntc to Adverse Pty of Removal, #4 State Court Amd Ntc to Adverse Pty of Removal) (alt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tomio B. Narita , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3322810, filed by Defendant Autovest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Constantino, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Amended NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190904577, filed by Autovest. Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Constantino, Gregory) Modified on 7/12/2019: added "Amended" to entry text - filer added exhibit that wasn't included with original entry but failed to file attachments separately (alt)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Autovest, Plaintiff Wayland Kathan. (nl)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed without paying the filing fee. Correction: Filing fee was taken manually and the receipt information was added to the docket entry. re #2 Notice of Removal,. (tlh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190904577, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681087068) Fee filed by Autovest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) (Constantino, Gregory) Modified on 7/11/2019 by adding filing fee information (tlh).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Defendant Autovest is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathan v. Autovest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autovest
Represented By: Gregory M. Constantino
Represented By: Tomio B. Narita
Represented By: R. Travis Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayland Kathan
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?