BMO Harris Bank NA v. JGQTransportationLLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Defendant: JGQTransportationLLC and Juan Carlos Guerrero
Case Number: 2:2019cv00489
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/19/2019. (jds)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/16/2019. (reb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to JUAN CARLOS GUERRERO. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to JGBTRANSPORTATION. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Juan Carlos Guerrero, JGQTransportationLLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3323185) filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loan & Security Agreement 1, #2 Exhibit B - Loan & Security Agreement 2, #3 Exhibit C - Loan & Security Agreement 3, #4 Exhibit D - Loan & Security Agreement 4, #5 Exhibit E - Continuing Guaranties, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Marcy, Lisa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank NA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank NA v. JGQTransportationLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JGQTransportationLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Carlos Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By: Trenton L. Lowe
Represented By: Lisa A. Marcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?