Tasman v. Sundance Mountain Resort et al
Plaintiff: Shelly Tasman
Defendant: Sundance Partners, Ziptour, Sundance Mountain Resort, Versa Integrity Group, Zipholdings and Terra-Nova
Case Number: 2:2019cv00495
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Shelly Tasman. (Harris, Brittani)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #19 Counterclaim filed by Shelly Tasman.(Harris, Brittani)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court hereby orders Ms. Tasman to show cause why the court should not dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ms. Tasman must respond to this order no later than September 25, 2019, with information about Defendants partners and members and their citizenship. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/4/2019. (jds)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/30/2019. (jds)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Versa Integrity Group. (Burt, Bruce)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce C. Burt on behalf of Versa Integrity Group (Burt, Bruce)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Gainer M. Waldbillig on behalf of Sundance Partners (Waldbillig, Gainer)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM for Apportionment of Fault against Ziptour, Zipholdings, Terra-Nova, COUNTERCLAIM for Breach of Contract against Shelly Tasman filed by Sundance Mountain Resort, Sundance Partners. Attorney Meghan A. Sheridan added to party Sundance Mountain Resort(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan A. Sheridan added to party Sundance Partners(pty:dft)(Sheridan, Meghan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell per 17 docket text order. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. In light of the procedural posture of this case and the pending #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Terra-Nova, Zipholdings, and Ziptour, consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge is not feasible at this time. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/16/2019. No attached document.(jfm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P. Atkinson on behalf of Terra-Nova, Zipholdings, Ziptour (Atkinson, Ryan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Terra-Nova, Zipholdings, Ziptour. Attorney Jack D. Smart added to party Terra-Nova(pty:dft), Attorney Jack D. Smart added to party Zipholdings(pty:dft), Attorney Jack D. Smart added to party Ziptour(pty:dft)(Smart, Jack)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Tasman as to Sundance Mountain Resort served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons)(Harris, Brittani)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Tasman as to Sundance Partners served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons)(Harris, Brittani)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Tasman as to Ziptour served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons)(Harris, Brittani)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Tasman as to Zipholdings served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons)(Harris, Brittani)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Tasman as to Terra-Nova served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons)(Harris, Brittani)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Tasman as to Versa Integrity Group served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Harris, Brittani)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ziptour. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Versa Integrity Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Zipholdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Terra-Nova. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sundance Partners. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sundance Mountain Resort. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3324107) filed by Shelly Tasman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Harris, Brittani)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Shelly Tasman is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tasman v. Sundance Mountain Resort et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundance Partners
Represented By: Meghan A. Sheridan
Represented By: Gainer M. Waldbillig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ziptour
Represented By: Jack D. Smart
Represented By: Ryan P. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundance Mountain Resort
Represented By: Meghan A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versa Integrity Group
Represented By: Bruce C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zipholdings
Represented By: Jack D. Smart
Represented By: Ryan P. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra-Nova
Represented By: Jack D. Smart
Represented By: Ryan P. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Tasman
Represented By: Christopher M. Ault
Represented By: Brittani S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?